Payton v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Laura Payton
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00644
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
2 Judge: William V Gallo
3 Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1693ef
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Joint Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant Bank of America, N.A. ("Defendant") does not need to need to file a response to the Complaint. Plaintiff will file an amended complaint by 6/23/2021. Defendant's response to the amended complaint will be due 45 days after service of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/2/2021. (tcf)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by Bank of America, N.A. (Callaway, David) (tcf).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge Roger T. Benitez, Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:21-cv-00484-L-WVG. The new case number is 21cv0644-L-WVG. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/10/2021. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/10/2021.(mme)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Barry William Lee on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Lee, Barry)Attorney Barry William Lee added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft) (tcf).
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Notice of Related Case filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Callaway, David) (tcf).
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Laura Payton of case(s) 3:21-cv-00484-L-WVG . (Swigart, Joshua) (tcf).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #8 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before June 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/28/2021. (mme)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Allison Funk, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/28/2021.(rmc)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliana G. Blaha on behalf of Laura Payton (Blaha, Juliana)Attorney Juliana G. Blaha added to party Laura Payton(pty:pla) (mme).
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Callaway, David) (mme).
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A... (Callaway, David) (mme).
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15665285.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Funk, Allison) (rmc).
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Rossiter Callaway on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Callaway, David)Attorney David Rossiter Callaway added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft) (mme).
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Payton. Bank of America served. (Swigart, Joshua) Modified on 4/27/2021 to correct party serviced (mme).
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Laura Payton (Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Laura Payton(pty:pla) (mme).
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (dlg).
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bank of America, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15616545.), filed by Laura Payton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-644-BEN-DEB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(fth) (dlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payton v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: David Rossiter Callaway
Represented By: Barry William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Payton
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Juliana G. Blaha
Represented By: Joshua Brandon Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?