Gaynor et al v. Slade et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Gaynor and Don Gaynor
Defendant: Does 1 through 30, Chad Slade and Linda McCraken
Case Number: 3:2021cv00777
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward R. Sublett, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Martinez, Ralph)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor (Martinez, Ralph)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor (Martinez, Ralph) QC email, attorney Edward Sublett should file a notice of appearance and sign document (dlg).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/30/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 6/1/21.(dlg)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM against Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor, filed by Linda McCraken, Chad Slade. (Straggas, George) (dlg).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Linda McCraken, Chad Slade.(Straggas, George)Attorney George D. Straggas added to party Linda McCraken(pty:dft), Attorney George D. Straggas added to party Chad Slade(pty:dft) (dlg).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor as to Chad Slade (Martinez, Ralph) (dlg).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor as to Linda McCracken (Martinez, Ralph) (dlg).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor. (Martinez, Ralph) (dlg).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dxf)(jrd)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Chad Slade, Linda Mccraken, Does 1 through 30, (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15639706.), filed by Don Gaynor, Nancy Gaynor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-777-GPC-NLS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Martinez, Ralph G.)(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaynor et al v. Slade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Slade
Represented By: George D. Straggas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda McCraken
Represented By: George D. Straggas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Gaynor
Represented By: Ralph Glenn Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Gaynor
Represented By: Ralph Glenn Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?