Dalfio v. The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC et al
Plaintiff: Victor Dalfio
Defendant: Does 1-10 and The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00790
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Request to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to file and serve a responsive pleading is extended to July 7, 2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/4/2021. (mme)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grammatico, Paul)Attorney Paul A. Grammatico added to party The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC(pty:dft) *QC Mailer sent - proposed order should not be attached* (mme).
May 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor Dalfio. The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC served. (Steven, Laura) (mme).
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda) (jms).
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15646817.), filed by Victor Dalfio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-790-DMS-AHG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Shahriari, Peter)(zda) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalfio v. The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Grammatico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Dalfio
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?