Brittingham v. Entegra Coach, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin W. Brittingham
Defendant: La Mesa R.V. Center, Inc., Entegra Coach, Inc. and Jayco, Inc. dba Entegra Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00833
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER - This matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear that partys own attorneys fees and costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure due to the parties filing of their Joint Motion for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice. ECF No. 19.(no document attached) (jpp)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER vacating Settlement Disposition Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/17/2021.(jpp)
November 11, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice by Jayco, Inc. dba Entegra Coach, Inc.. (Gonzales, Dolores) (jpp).
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER confirming settlement and setting deadline to file joint for dismissal. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 11/23/2021 at 9:30am. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/14/2021.(jpp)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement by Martin W. Brittingham (Dalton, Richard) (jpp).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Telephonic Case Management Conference held 9/08/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/09/2021.(jpp)
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 11/08/2021 at 1:30pm. (jpp)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER continuing Telephonic Case Management Conference to 9/8/2021 at 1:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/21/2021. (jpp) (dlg).
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Martin W. Brittingham. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit)(Dalton, Richard) (jpp).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Telephonic Case Management Conference for 8/2/2021 at 2:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/30/2021.(jpp)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Zoom Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/30/2021. Case did not settle. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Richard Collins Dalton). (Defendant Attorney Dolores E Gonzales). (no document attached) (djg)
June 18, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Jayco, Inc. dba Entegra Coach, Inc. and Plaintiff, Martin Brittingham (Gonzales, Dolores) (jpp).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/30/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 6/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/27/2021.(mme)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jayco, Inc. dba Entegra Coach, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Gonzales, Dolores) (mme).
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jayco, Inc. dba Entegra Coach, Inc..(Gonzales, Dolores)Attorney Dolores E Gonzales added to party Jayco, Inc. dba Entegra Coach, Inc.(pty:dft) (mme).
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by La Mesa R.V. Center, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Gonzales, Dolores) (mme).
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by La Mesa R.V. Center, Inc..(Gonzales, Dolores)Attorney Dolores E Gonzales added to party La Mesa R.V. Center, Inc.(pty:dft) (mme).
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin W. Brittingham, as to Entegra Coach, Inc.. (Dalton, Richard) (mme).
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (dlg).
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Martin W. Brittingham. No Parties With Financial Interest. (fth) (dlg).
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Entegra Coach, Inc., La Mesa R.V. Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15671759.), filed by Martin W. Brittingham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-833-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Dalton, Richard)(fth) (dlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittingham v. Entegra Coach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Mesa R.V. Center, Inc.
Represented By: Dolores E Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entegra Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco, Inc. dba Entegra Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Dolores E Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin W. Brittingham
Represented By: Richard Collins Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?