Cleveland et al v. Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd.
Plaintiff: Dr. Karen Oegema, Frank Furnari, Dr. Richard Kolodner, Dr. Don Cleveland, Dr. Bing Ren, Dr. Paul Mischel and Dr. Arshad Desai
Defendant: Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00871
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
3 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/2/2021. (sjt)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1, the court takes Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate (Doc. No. #6 ) under submission and vacates the June 28, 2021 hearing. Order to follow in due course.(no document attached) (gac)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Case No. 19-cv-2141-JM-JLB filed by Don Cleveland, Arshad Desai, Frank Furnari, Richard Kolodner, Paul Mischel, Karen Oegema, Bing Ren. (Olinik, Michael) (sjt).
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Case No. 19-cv-2141-JM-JLB filed by Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd.. (Frischling, Gary) (sjt).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #7 ). Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 7/6/21. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/28/21. (jmo)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Don Cleveland, Arshad Desai, Frank Furnari, Richard Kolodner, Paul Mischel, Karen Oegema, Bing Ren. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Olinik, #2 Exhibit 1)(Olinik, Michael) (jmo).
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd.. (Oncidi, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Joseph Oncidi added to party Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd.(pty:dft) (jmo).
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Case No. 19-cv-2141-JM-JLB by Don Cleveland, Arshad Desai, Frank Furnari, Richard Kolodner, Paul Mischel, Karen Oegema, Bing Ren. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Olinik, Michael) (jmo).
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Oegema, Arshad Desai, Richard Kolodner, Paul Mischel, Don Cleveland, Bing Ren, Frank Furnari. Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd. served. (Olinik, Michael) (jmo).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw, Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-02141-JM-JLB. The new case number is 20cv871-JM-JLB.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/12/2021. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/12/2021.(jmr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (jms).
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Don Cleveland, Arshad Desai, Frank Furnari, Richard Kolodner, Paul Mischel, Karen Oegema, Bing Ren of case(s) 19-cv-02141-JM-JLB. (smd) (jms).
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15696908.), filed by Karen Oegema, Arshad Desai, Richard Kolodner, Paul Mischel, Don Cleveland, Bing Ren, Frank Furnari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-871-DMS-AHG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Olinik, Michael)(smd)(jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland et al v. Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Karen Oegema
Represented By: Michael G. Olinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Furnari
Represented By: Michael G. Olinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Richard Kolodner
Represented By: Michael G. Olinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Don Cleveland
Represented By: Michael G. Olinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Bing Ren
Represented By: Michael G. Olinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Paul Mischel
Represented By: Michael G. Olinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Arshad Desai
Represented By: Michael G. Olinik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ludwig Institute for Cancer Research Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Oncidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?