Lepore v. Aras Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Meredith Lepore
Defendant: Jeff Louie, Ravi Sankaran, Terry Quan, Neil Komer, Does 1 through 100, Aras Corporation and Ben Schieber
Case Number: 3:2021cv00922
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. The Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference on 6/25/2021. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 5/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. A Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 7/1/2022. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/12/2022 at 11:00 AM before District Judge William Q. Hayes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/28/2021.(ag)
June 28, 2021 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/25/2021. The case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 6/25/2021. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Rashtian). (Defendant Attorneys Daryl Landy, Nancy Nguyen). (Daniel Wilcox, Karen Schroer, Brenda Tyer). (no document attached) (ssn)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Defendants' #15 Ex Parte Application to Excuse the Individual Defendants' Attendance at the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/22/2021. (ag)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: Any opposition by Plaintiff to Defendants' Motion to Excuse Appearance of Individual Defendants [ECF No. 15] shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. PST on Monday, June 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/18/2021.(ssn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Individual Defendants at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, by Aras Corporation, Neil Komer, Jeff Louie, Terry Quan, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Excuse Individual Defendants' Attendance at ENE)(Landy, Daryl) (jpp).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #12 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/16/2021. (ag)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Aras Corporation, Neil Komer, Jeff Louie, Terry Quan, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber re #10 Order on Motion to Continue, #6 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference (Landy, Daryl) (ag).
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Discovery Plan by Aras Corporation, Neil Komer, Jeff Louie, Terry Quan, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber. (Nguyen, Nancy) (ag).
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy M. N. Nguyen on behalf of Aras Corporation, Neil Komer, Jeff Louie, Terry Quan, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber (Nguyen, Nancy)Attorney Nancy M. N. Nguyen added to party Aras Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy M. N. Nguyen added to party Neil Komer(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy M. N. Nguyen added to party Jeff Louie(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy M. N. Nguyen added to party Terry Quan(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy M. N. Nguyen added to party Ravi Sankaran(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy M. N. Nguyen added to party Ben Schieber(pty:dft) (ag).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying #7 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/15/2021. (ag)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Meredith Lepore shall file any motion to remand on or before September 13, 2021. (no document attached) (ag)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(C) by Aras Corporation, Neil Komer, Jeff Louie, Terry Quan, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber. (Landy, Daryl) (ag).
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines by Aras Corporation, Neil Komer, Jeff Louie, Terry Quan, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber. (Landy, Daryl) (ag).
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/25/2021 at 10:00am. Joint Discovery Plan due 6/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 5/18/2021.(jpp)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Aras Corporation, Jeff Louie, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber, Terry Quan, Neil Komer. (fth) (dlg).
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Aras Corporation, Jeff Louie, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber, Terry Quan, Neil Komer. No Parties With Financial Interest. (fth) (dlg).
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aras Corporation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (fth) (dlg).
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Aras Corporation, Jeff Louie, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber, Terry Quan, Neil Komer. (fth) (dlg).
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15724687.), filed by Aras Corporation, Jeff Louie, Ravi Sankaran, Ben Schieber, Terry Quan, Neil Komer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration of Benedict Schieber in support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #5 Declaration of Karen Schroer in support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #6 Notice of Neil Komer in support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #7 Declaration of Terry Quan in support of Defendants' Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:21-cv-922-WQH-LL. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (fth) (dlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lepore v. Aras Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Louie
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Nancy M. N. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravi Sankaran
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Nancy M. N. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Quan
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Nancy M. N. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Komer
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Nancy M. N. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aras Corporation
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Nancy M. N. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Schieber
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Represented By: Nancy M. N. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Lepore
Represented By: Siavash Daniel Rashtian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?