Romoff et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Joe Siciliano and Robert Romoff
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00938
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Abirami Gnanadesigan on behalf of General Motors LLC (Gnanadesigan, Abirami)Attorney Abirami Gnanadesigan added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Whitefield on behalf of General Motors LLC (Whitefield, Derek)Attorney Derek S. Whitefield added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J Kevin Snyder on behalf of General Motors LLC (Snyder, J)Attorney J Kevin Snyder added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOC 4 by Robert Romoff, Joe Siciliano re #4 Writ of Execution Returned Executed (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (ag).
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Romoff, Joe Siciliano, as to General Motors LLC. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (ag).
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF DOC 3 by Robert Romoff, Joe Siciliano re #3 Affidavit of Service (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (ag).
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Goren Gold on behalf of Robert Romoff, Joe Siciliano (Gold, Sophia)Attorney Sophia Goren Gold added to party Robert Romoff(pty:pla), Attorney Sophia Goren Gold added to party Joe Siciliano(pty:pla) (ag).
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 DCOUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT NO. #8 - Writ of Execution Returned Executed on 06/03/2021. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (ag). Modified on 6/16/2021 to note that this document is withdrawn (ag).
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT NO. #6 - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on General Motors on 04/20/2021, filed by Robert Romoff, Joe Siciliano. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (ag). Modified on 6/9/2021 to note that this document is withdrawn (ag).
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (dlg).
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15731953.), filed by Robert Romoff, Joe Siciliano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-938-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (fth) (dlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romoff et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Siciliano
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Romoff
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Abirami Gnanadesigan
Represented By: Derek S. Whitefield
Represented By: J Kevin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?