Wilson v. Buckel et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Earl Wilson, Jr.
Defendant: Raquel Buckel, Daniel Paramo, CDC Officer Hugee and Randy Fisher
Case Number: 3:2021cv01004
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #10 ) and Plaintiff is given an additional one hundred twenty (120) days leave from the date this Order is signed in which to comply with the Court's 6/11/2021 Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended pleading within this time frame, the Court will dismiss this entire action for the reasons set forth in the 6/11/2021 Order and for failing to comply with a Court Order. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/22/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) Modified on 7/22/2021 to note that Plaintiff was mailed a copy of the Court's civil rights complaint form (ag).
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Jimmy Earl Wilson, Jr. (jms)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #3 and #5 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b). The Court directs the Secretary of the CDCR, or her designee, to collect from Plaintiff's trust account the $350 filing fee owed in this case by garnishing monthly payments from his account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forwarding those payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Court grants Plaintiff forty five (45) days leave to file an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading described in this Order. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/10/2021. (A copy of this Order was served on Kathleen Allison, Secretary CDCR) (A civil rights complaint form was mailed to the Plaintiff)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford assigned to transfer case from the Northern District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached)(jms)(jrd)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from the Northern District of California; Case Number 1:21-cv-03422-RMI. Original file received electronically.
May 26, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of California (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 05/25/2021. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Earl Wilson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Copy of #4 mailed to plaintiff (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/14/2021. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Earl Wilson, Jr. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jimmy Earl Wilson, Jr. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raquel Buckel, Randy Fisher, Hugee, Daniel Paramo (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Jimmy Earl Wilson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2021: #2 Complaint (Corrected Scan)) (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 5/26/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Buckel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Buckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC Officer Hugee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Earl Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?