United States of America et al v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc et al
Case Number: 3:2021cv01109
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act - Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: 1) Granting Defendant Apex Systems, LLC's Motion To Dismiss The Amended Complaint [ECF No. 20 ] 2) Granting Defendant General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint [ECF No. 22 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 9/15/2022. (ddf)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Dismissing Without Prejudice Count One Of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 5/4/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ddf)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: (1) Requiring Plaintiff to Show Cause Why Count 1 Should Not be Dismissed; and (2) Unsealing Action( Order to Show Cause Brief due by 11/3/2021), Order to Unseal Case. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/20/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?