Wood v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Gina Wood
Respondent: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01146
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 31 Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (rmc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-01929. Original file received electronically
June 17, 2021 Filing 29 Conditional Transfer Order - 01 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL MDL No. 2992, transferring case to USDC, United States District Court for the Southern District of California and assigned to Honorable Honorable Larry Alan Burns.. Case transferred electronically. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Gina Wood. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 27 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Bank of America, N.A. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Gina Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #24 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Court hereby orders that that Defendant shall have through and including June 14, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 14, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Callaway, #2 Proposed Order)(Callaway, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-10052 FLA(RAOx) (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Related Case(s) Bank of America, N.A.. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-3385, 2:20-cv-10052, 21-cv-00518 (Callaway, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Initial Complaint, and good cause having been shown, the Court hereby orders that that Defendant shall have through and including June 7, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #20 , by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Pursuant to the Parties Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Initial Complaint, and good cause having been shown, the Court hereby orders that that Defendant shall have through and including June 7, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 7, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Callaway, #2 Proposed Order)(Callaway, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Miscellaneous Document #18 . Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and good cause having been shown, the Court hereby orders (i) that the Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Bank of America, N.A. entered on April 14, 2021 (Dkt. #15) shall be set aside; and (ii) that Defendant shall have through and including May 6, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 Joint Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #15 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callaway, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Funk, Allison M. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bank of America, N.A, designating Stoll, Laura A. as local counsel. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Barry W Lee on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Attorney Barry W Lee added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(Lee, Barry) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 15 [SET ASIDE PER COURT ORDER, DOCKET ENTRY NO. 19] DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Bank of America, N.A. (yl) Modified on 4/16/2021 (mrgo). [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 6, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rossiter Callaway, #2 Proposed Order)(Callaway, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT & Notice of Party with Financial Interest filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. identifying BAC North America Holding Company as Corporate Parent. (Callaway, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison M. Funk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31108028) filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Laura Alexandra Stoll added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Stoll, Laura) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Rossiter Callaway on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Attorney David Rossiter Callaway added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(Callaway, David) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 First REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Bank of America, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Gina Wood. Request set for hearing on 5/10/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
April 11, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Gina Wood, upon Defendant Bank of America, N.A. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gina Wood. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 Plaintiff's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gina Wood, (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gina Wood. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30800853 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Gina Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr added to party Gina Wood(pty:pla))(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Wood
Represented By: Ernest Joseph Franceschi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: David Rossiter Callaway
Represented By: Laura Alexandra Stoll
Represented By: Allison Marie Funk
Represented By: Barry William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?