Curley v. Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Korey Curley
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01200
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Supplemental) filed by Korey Curley. (Hill, James) (dlg).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Dixon in Support of Defendant PAR Electrical Contractors, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court)(Lutz, Jennifer) (dlg).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Korey Curley. (Hill, James) (dlg).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to continue the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference (ECF #14 ) is granted. The ENE and CMC are continued to September 29, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. The Joint Discovery Plan and ENE Statements are now due September 20, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 8/4/2021. (no document attached) (say)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by Korey Curley. (Hill, James) (zda).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. of case(s) 37-2019-00033118-CU-OE-CTL . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Mebane Complaint)(Dixon, Christine) (zda).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Yoon Dixon on behalf of Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Dixon, Christine)Attorney Christine Yoon Dixon added to party Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.(pty:dft) (zda).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Remand re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Responses due by 8/5/2021 Replies due by 8/12/2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/23/2021.(zda) (jms).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Korey Curley. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of J. Jason Hill, #3 Proof of Service)(Hill, James) (dlg).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/21/21. (dlg)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.. (Lutz, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer N. Lutz added to party Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Plaintiff by Brad H. Nakase on behalf of Korey Curley (Nakase, Brad)Attorney Brad H. Nakase added to party Korey Curley(pty:pla) (dlg).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Singer on behalf of Korey Curley (Singer, Michael)Attorney Michael D. Singer added to party Korey Curley(pty:pla) (dlg).
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/13/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/2/21.(dlg)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. Re Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Slattery, J L)(dlg).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. (dxf)(jrd)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. Identifying Corporate Parent Quanta Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Quanta Electric Power Services West, LLC, Corporate Parent Quanta West, LLC, Corporate Parent QSI, Inc. for Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. (dxf)(jrd)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15882918.), filed by Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1200-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curley v. Par Electrical Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Electrical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: J L Sean Slattery
Represented By: Jennifer N. Lutz
Represented By: Christine Yoon Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korey Curley
Represented By: James Jason Hill
Represented By: Brad H. Nakase
Represented By: Michael D. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?