Thistle v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: John David Thistle and David John Thistle
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Vina Patel-Mehta, Kristy A. Ditzler and Primary Care Medical Doctors
Case Number: 3:2021cv01218
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 cv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff David John Thistle (ECF No. [2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiff David John Thistle may file a Motion to File an Amended Complaint within sixty (60) says of the date of this Order. If no motion is filed, the Clerk of the Court shall close this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Request for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff David John Thistle (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/8/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Appointment of Counsel by David John Thistle. (ag)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Additional EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint by David John Thistle.(ag)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David John Thistle. (dxf)(jrd)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Vina Patel-Mehta, Kristy A. Ditzler, Primary Care Medical Doctors, IFP Filed, filed by David John Thistle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1218-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thistle v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Thistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David John Thistle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vina Patel-Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy A. Ditzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Care Medical Doctors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?