Valenzuela v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christina Valenzuela
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv01223
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 wc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chantal R. Jenkins on behalf of Andrew Saul (Jenkins, Chantal)Attorney Chantal R. Jenkins added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft) (jpp).
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Christina Valenzuela. (dxf)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Valenzuela. Andrew Saul served. (Sandoval, Matty) (jpp).
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Linda Lopez has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (ekb) (jms). (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/7/2021) (ekb).
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ekb) (jms).
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15895569.), filed by Christina Valenzuela. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1223-LL. Magistrate (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valenzuela v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Valenzuela
Represented By: Matty Michael Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Chantal R. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?