Baltazar v. ACE Parking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Baltazar
Defendant: ACE Parking, Inc., ACE Parking Facilities, Inc., ACE Parking Management, Inc. and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2021cv01228
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gloria Baltazar. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rodriguez, Monique)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ACE Parking Facilities, Inc., ACE Parking Management, Inc., ACE Parking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle Dente)(Evans, Sarah) (jpp).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER vacating Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference pending resolution of motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 8/09/2021.(jpp)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gloria Baltazar. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff Gloria Baltazar's Motion to Remand to State Court, #2 Declaration of Monique R. Rodriguez in support of Plaintiff Gloria Baltazar's Motion to Remand to State Court, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Monique R. Rodriguez in support of Plaintiff Gloria Baltazar's Motion to Remand to State Court, #4 Proof of Service)(Rodriguez, Monique) (jpp).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via Videoconfernce. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/29/2021 at 9:30am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 7/23/2021.(jpp)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by ACE Parking Facilities, Inc., ACE Parking Management, Inc., ACE Parking, Inc..(Evans, Sarah) (jpp).
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE Parking Facilities, Inc., ACE Parking Management, Inc., ACE Parking, Inc., Does 1 through 50. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (smd) (jms).
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15901564.), filed by ACE Parking, Inc., ACE Parking Management, Inc., Does 1 through 50, ACE Parking Facilities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1228-L-AHG. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(smd)(jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baltazar v. ACE Parking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Baltazar
Represented By: Monique Renee Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Parking, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Brite Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Parking Facilities, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Brite Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Parking Management, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Brite Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?