McNamara v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01245
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Larry Alan Burns
3 Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice)(Baiardo, Alicia) (jmr).
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Le, Anthony) (sjt).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2021. (jmr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance Alicia A. Baiardo by Alicia A. Baiardo on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Baiardo, Alicia)Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia A. Baiardo added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jmr).
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of David C. Powell by David C. Powell on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Powell, David)Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney David C. Powell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)(jmr).
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint and Modify Motion Briefing Schedule)(Le, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Q Le added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Q Le added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) QC Mailer, re: proposed order (jmr).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-01388-LAB-LL. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01245-LAB-LL. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/16/2021. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/19/2021.(jrm)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Moshe Rotter on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Rotter, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Moshe Rotter added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla)(jrm).
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Garth A. Spencer on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Spencer, Garth)Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla) (jrm).
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cornelia J.B. Gordon on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Gordon, Cornelia)Attorney Cornelia J.B. Gordon added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla) (jrm).
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Daniel Smith on behalf of Thomas W. McNamara (Smith, Logan)Attorney Logan Daniel Smith added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla)(jrm).
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth)(jrd)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Thomas W. McNamara of case(s) 18cv1388-LAB-LL. (fth)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15907027.), filed by Thomas W. McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1245-AJB-JLB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Glancy, Lionel) (fth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamara v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Lionel Z Glancy
Represented By: Cornelia J.B. Gordon
Represented By: Jonathan M. Rotter
Represented By: Logan Daniel Smith
Represented By: Garth A. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Alicia A. Baiardo
Represented By: Anthony Q Le
Represented By: David C. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alicia A. Baiardo
Represented By: Anthony Q Le
Represented By: David C. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?