Bender v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Erik Frank Bender
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv01256
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Lahey on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Lahey, Sharon)Attorney Sharon Lahey added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (jpp).
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erik Frank Bender. Kilolo Kijakazi served. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shapiro, Brian) (jpp).
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Erik Frank Bender. (fth)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Michael S. Berg has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (smd) (sjt).
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Erik Frank Bender. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15917248.), filed by Erik Frank Bender. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1256-MSB. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is assigned to the case. (Shapiro, Brian)(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Frank Bender
Represented By: Brian C Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?