E-Z Living LLC v. A10 Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: E-Z Living LLC
Defendant: A10 Capital, LLC, A10 Capital Holding Company, LLC, A10 Permanent Asset Financing 2017-II, LLC, A10 Reit Holdings, LLC and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2021cv01270
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 bfd
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 6/6/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/9/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2023 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/27/21.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: (Z)Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/25/2021. Case did not settle. (Z)Case Management Conference held on 8/25/2021. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Fari Bari Nejadpour). (Defendant Attorney Ronald A McIntire, Carrie Akinaka). (no document attached) (bll)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by A10 Capital Holding Company, LLC, A10 Capital, LLC, A10 Permanent Asset Financing 2017-II, LLC, A10 Reit Holdings, LLC re #4 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, (McIntire, Ronald) (jrm).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/15/2021.(jrm)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A10 Capital Holding Company, LLC, A10 Capital, LLC, A10 Permanent Asset Financing 2017-II, LLC, A10 Reit Holdings, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (ekb). (jms).
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by A10 Capital Holding Company, LLC, A10 Capital, LLC, A10 Permanent Asset Financing 2017-II, LLC, A10 Reit Holdings, LLC. (ekb) (jms).
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15925007.), filed by A10 Reit Holdings, LLC, A10 Permanent Asset Financing 2017-II, LLC, A10 Capital Holding Company, LLC, A10 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Ronald A. McIntire, #3 State Court Documents)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1270-W-BLM. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(ekb)(jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E-Z Living LLC v. A10 Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-Z Living LLC
Represented By: Fari Bari Nejadpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A10 Capital, LLC
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A10 Capital Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A10 Permanent Asset Financing 2017-II, LLC
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A10 Reit Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ronald A McIntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?