Colon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Raymundo Jude Colon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv01293
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (Attachments: #1 in forma pauperis letter)(jpp)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. (Summons and IFP package prepared). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/20/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Raymundo Jude Colon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mouradian, Lisa) (jpp).
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Raymundo Jude Colon. (ekb) (jms).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/28/2021. (jpp)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Bernard G. Skomal has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (ekb) (jms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymundo Jude Colon. (ekb) (jms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, IFP Filed, filed by Raymundo Jude Colon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Appeals Action)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1293-BGS. Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is assigned to the case. (Mouradian, Lisa)(ekb) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymundo Jude Colon
Represented By: Lisa Siroun Mouradian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?