Rafou v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Souad Rafou
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01294
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion for Dismissal. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 10/8/2021. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 10/8/2021, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 10/19/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 8/20/2021.(zda)(jms).
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Ford Motor Company (Avelar, Jason) (zda).
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Kelly Cline on behalf of Souad Rafou (Cline, Brian)Attorney Brian Kelly Cline added to party Souad Rafou(pty:pla) (zda).
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Anthony Johnson on behalf of Souad Rafou (Johnson, Mark)Attorney Mark Anthony Johnson added to party Souad Rafou(pty:pla) (zda).
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Souad Rafou. (Moses, Jeffrey) (zda).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/1/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 6/20/2021.(zda) (jms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc., and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, and certain affiliates for Ford Motor Company. (ekb) (jms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ford Motor Company. (ekb) (jms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (ekb). (jms).
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15941980.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jason M. Avelar, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibits B-D, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Documents, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1294-DMS-LL. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(ekb) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafou v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Souad Rafou
Represented By: Jeffrey Orville Moses
Represented By: Brian Kelly Cline
Represented By: Mark Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jason Michael Avelar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?