Viriyavong et al v. Rust-Oleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tina Viriyavong, Soukthavy Viriyavong, Phoudmany Langland, Phahatsinh Viriyavong, Kevin Viriyavong and Sandra Sihakoun
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation, The Home Depot Genesee Store and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2021cv01322
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER regulating discovery and other pre-trial proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/30/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/16/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2022 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13B before Judge John A. Houston.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/31/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: (Z)Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/30/2021. Case did not settle. (Z)Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2021. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Jeremy Cronin, Jessica Figueroa). (Defendant Attorney Karen M. Sullivan, Robert K. Dixon). (no document attached) (bll)
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy R. Cronin on behalf of Tina Viriyavong (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cronin, Jeremy)Attorney Jeremy R. Cronin added to party Tina Viriyavong(pty:pla) (jpp).
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Rust-Oleum Corporation re #7 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference (Sullivan, Karen) (jpp).
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Rust-Oleum Corporation. (Sullivan, Karen) (jpp).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/30/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/26/2021. (jpp)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by The Home Depot Genesee Store . Identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc., Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for The Home Depot Genesee Store. (Dixon, Robert) (jpp).
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL by The Home Depot Genesee Store re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert K. Dixon in Support of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Notice of Consent to Removal, #2 Exhibit One to Declaration - Print Outs from Secretary of State Website)(Dixon, Robert) (jpp).
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rust-Oleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent RPM International, Inc. for Rust-Oleum Corporation. (rmc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Rust-Oleum Corporation. Identifying Corporate Parent RPM Consumer Group, Inc., Corporate Parent RPM International, Inc. for Rust-Oleum Corporation. (rmc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by The Home Depot Genesee Store. (rmc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACASDC-15954365.), filed by Rust-Oleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration of Shayla Bullock, #4 Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1322-JAH-BLM. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viriyavong et al v. Rust-Oleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Viriyavong
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Figueroa
Represented By: Jeremy R. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soukthavy Viriyavong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoudmany Langland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phahatsinh Viriyavong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Viriyavong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Sihakoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation
Represented By: Karen M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot Genesee Store
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?