Escamilla v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Escamilla
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 3:2021cv01383
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic, counsel-only Case Management Conference held on 9/30/2021. Scheduling order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas D. Luneau). (Defendant Attorney Roger W. Backlar). (no document attached) (cxe)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Backlar, Roger) (tcf).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Good cause appearing, the parties' #9 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the ENE is CONTINUED to 10/18/2021, at 9:15 AM before Judge Burkhardt. On or before 10/8/2021, the parties shall lodge ENE statements with Judge Burkhardt's chambers via e-mail at efile_burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov. In addition, the Case Management Conference presently set for 9/30/2021, at 1:45 PM is CONVERTED to a telephonic, counsel-only conference. For purposes of the Conference, all participating counsel shall call the Court's teleconference line at (877) 873-8018 and use access code 9930765. All other deadlines, requirements, and directions set forth in the Court's #5 8/4/2021 Order remain in effect. (no document attached) (cxe)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue or Advance Early Neutral Evaluation by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Backlar, Roger)Attorney Roger Willner Backlar added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: proposed order attached (tcf).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Good cause appearing, the parties' #6 Joint Motion to Continue is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ENE) and Case Management Conference are CONTINUED to 9/30/2021, at 1:45 PM before Judge Burkhardt. On or before 9/21/2021, the parties shall lodge ENE statements with Judge Burkhardt's chambers via e-mail at efile_burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov. All other deadlines, requirements, and directions set forth in the Court's #5 8/4/2021 Order remain in effect. (no document attached) (cxe)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Forman, Stephanie) (tcf).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie) (tcf).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conferences. An Early Neutral Evaluation will be held by video conference on 9/15/2021 at 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 9/15/2021, and will be held at the conclusion of the ENE. The parties shall file a Joint Discovery Plan on or before 9/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/4/2021. (tcf)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (smd) (sjt).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (smd) (sjt).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (smd) (sjt).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15986904.), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1383-MMA-JLB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escamilla v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Escamilla
Represented By: Thomas D Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Represented By: Roger Willner Backlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?