Gonzalez v. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2021cv01404
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
2 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 9/27/2021(no document attached) (ajf)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Asiano, Philip)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jesus Gonzalez. (Asiano, Philip)(sxa).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation via Zoom set for 10/5/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference via Zoom set for 10/5/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/9/21.(sxa) NEF regenerated on 8/10/2021 (sxa).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) Recusing from Case and (2) Requesting Reassignment. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. This case is reassigned to Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21-cv-1404-BTM-WVG. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/6/2021. (tcf)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. No Parties With Financial Interest. (nsf) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/5/2021) (sjt). Modified to add case stamps to document on 8/5/2021 (sjt).
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company.(nsf) (sjt).
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16000795.)filed by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Declaration Joseph E. Foss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1404-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(nsf) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/5/2021) (sjt). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/5/2021) (sjt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/5/2021) (sjt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/5/2021) (sjt). Modified to add case stamps to documents on 8/5/2021 (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By: Philip L. Asiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
Represented By: Joseph E Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?