Coppel et al v. SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Coppel, Elizabeth Flores, Miriam Garcia, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Micheli Ortega, Judith Uriostegui and Elizabeth Usselman
Defendant: SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc., SWBG, LLC, Board of Directors of SWBG, LLC, Orlando Corporate Operations Group, LLC, Mark G. Swanson, Elizabeth Gulacsy, Does 1 through 50 and IRS Form 5500 Signatory
Case Number: 3:2021cv01430
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. Elizabeth Gulacsy, IRS Form 5500 Signatory served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. Mark G. Swanson served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. SWBG, LLC served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Parras Ortega on behalf of Fernando Coppel, Elizabeth Flores, Miriam Garcia, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Micheli Ortega, Judith Uriostegui, Elizabeth Usselman (Ortega, Renee)Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Fernando Coppel (pty:pla), Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Elizabeth Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Miriam Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Pablo Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Tyler Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Micheli Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Judith Uriostegui(pty:pla), Attorney Renee Parras Ortega added to party Elizabeth Usselman(pty:pla) (anh).
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Clark on behalf of Fernando Coppel, Elizabeth Flores, Miriam Garcia, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Micheli Ortega, Judith Uriostegui, Elizabeth Usselman (Clark, James)Attorney James Clark added to party Fernando Coppel (pty:pla), Attorney James Clark added to party Elizabeth Flores(pty:pla), Attorney James Clark added to party Miriam Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney James Clark added to party Pablo Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney James Clark added to party Tyler Mitchell(pty:pla), Attorney James Clark added to party Micheli Ortega(pty:pla), Attorney James Clark added to party Judith Uriostegui(pty:pla), Attorney James Clark added to party Elizabeth Usselman(pty:pla) (anh).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint #11 . Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/16/2021. (zda)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Joint Motion and Stipulation Extending Time To Answer Complaint) by Board of Directors of SWBG, LLC, Does 1 through 50, Elizabeth Gulacsy, IRS Form 5500 Signatory, Orlando Corporate Operations Group, LLC, SWBG, LLC, SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc., Mark G. Swanson. (Carsten, Douglas)Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party Board of Directors of SWBG, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party Does 1 through 50(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party Elizabeth Gulacsy(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party IRS Form 5500 Signatory(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party Orlando Corporate Operations Group, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party SWBG, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas H Carsten added to party Mark G. Swanson (pty:dft) (anh).
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Joseph Sharman on behalf of Fernando Coppel, Elizabeth Flores, Miriam Garcia, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Micheli Ortega, Judith Uriostegui, Elizabeth Usselman (Sharman, Paul)Attorney Paul Joseph Sharman added to party Elizabeth Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Joseph Sharman added to party Miriam Garcia(pty:pla) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/2/2021) (anh). Modified to flatten on 9/2/2021 (anh).
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 PRO HAC APPROVED: Paul Joseph Sharman appearing for Plaintiffs Fernando Coppel, Elizabeth Flores, Miriam Garcia, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Micheli Ortega, Judith Uriostegui, Elizabeth Usselman (no document attached) (rmc)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16092374.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sharman, Paul) (rmc).
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. SWBG, LLC served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. IRS Form 5500 Signatory served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. Board of Directors of SWBG, LLC served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc. served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. Orlando Corporate Operations Group, LLC served. (Humphrey, Christina) (anh).
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (nsf) Modified on 8/10/2021 (nsf). Modified on 8/10/2021 (nsf). (sjt).
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Board of Directors of SWBG, LLC, Does 1 through 50, Elizabeth Gulacsy, Orlando Corporate Operations Group, LLC, SWBG, LLC, SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc., Mark G. Swanson ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16013347.), filed by Micheli Ortega, Elizabeth Flores, Pablo Martinez, Tyler Mitchell, Elizabeth Usselman, Fernando Coppel, Judith Uriostegui, Miriam Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1430-CAB-RBB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Humphrey, Christina)(nsf) Modified on 8/10/2021 (nsf). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coppel et al v. SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Coppel
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Flores
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Garcia
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Martinez
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Mitchell
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheli Ortega
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Uriostegui
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Usselman
Represented By: Christina A. Humphrey
Represented By: James Clark
Represented By: Paul Joseph Sharman
Represented By: Renee Parras Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeaWorld Parks & Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWBG, LLC
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors of SWBG, LLC
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Corporate Operations Group, LLC
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark G. Swanson
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Gulacsy
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS Form 5500 Signatory
Represented By: Douglas H Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?