Riccio v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Douglas Riccio
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 3:2021cv01433
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.. (Wang, Jenny)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Wang, Jenny)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for additional time to respond to 10/8/2021. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/01/2021. (jpp)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint (L.R. 12.1) by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days)(Wang, Jenny)Attorney Jenny H. Wang added to party Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft) (jpp).
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Riccio. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served. (Brehm, Brent) (jpp).
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (nsf)(sjt).
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16019802.) filed by Douglas Riccio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1433-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Brehm, Brent)(nsf) (sjt). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/11/2021) (nsf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riccio v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Riccio
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Jenny H. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?