Scott v. Blackstone Consulting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Penny A. Scott
Defendant: Blackstone Consulting, Inc. and Does 1 Through 10
Case Number: 3:2021cv01470
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Joint Motion to Stay. The Court further DIRECTS the parties to file a joint status report on the progress or outcome of the mediation on or before 3/31/2022. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/15/2021. (tcf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay re #12 Order on Motion to Stay, (Renewed) by Penny A. Scott. (De La Rosa, Kristina) (tcf).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying #7 Joint Motion to Stay Case. The Court DENIES the parties' joint motion without prejudice to renewing their request in the event Plaintiff declines to file a motion to remand. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/22/2021. (tcf)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Order Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference (ENE/CMC). In light of the parties' joint motion to stay, the Court hereby VACATES the October 13, 2021 ENE/CMC and related deadlines. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference with counsel for the parties on November 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. To participate in the conference, counsel must call 1-877-873-8017 and use access code 2924630. The parties' motion to stay remains pending before the Honorable Michael M. Anello. Any questions regarding this order may be directed to the Court's staff at 619-446-3964. ( Status Conference set for 11/5/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.)(no document attached) (src)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Rosemary C. Khoury on Behalf of Plaintiff by Rosemary Khoury on behalf of Penny A. Scott (Khoury, Rosemary)Attorney Rosemary Khoury added to party Penny A. Scott(pty:pla) (tcf).
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Kristina De La Rosa on Behalf of Plaintiff by Kristina A De La Rosa on behalf of Penny A. Scott (De La Rosa, Kristina)Attorney Kristina A De La Rosa added to party Penny A. Scott(pty:pla) (tcf).
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Isam C. Khoury on Behalf of Plaintiff by Isam C Khoury on behalf of Penny A. Scott (Khoury, Isam)Attorney Isam C Khoury added to party Penny A. Scott(pty:pla) (tcf).
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Case and Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Penny A. Scott. (Singer, Michael) (tcf).
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 Minute Order Continuing Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) and Case Management Conference (CMC). Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the ENE/CMC set for October 6, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. are hereby CONTINUED to October 13, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The parties' confidential ENE briefs are due to be lodged in chambers on or before October 6, 2021. All other deadlines, instructions and mandatory procedures set forth in the Court's August 19, 2021 Notice and Order [Doc. No. 4] remain in effect. Any questions regarding the ENE/CMC may be directed to the Court's staff at 619-446-3964. (Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford., Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/13/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.)(no document attached) (src)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice and Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Conference; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/19/21.(jmo)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (dxf)(jrd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Blackstone Consulting, Inc. Identifying Other Affiliate California's Labor and Workforce Development Agency. (dxf)(jrd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blackstone Consulting, Inc. No Corporate Parents / Interested Parties. (dxf)(jrd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16048086.), filed by Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal, #9 Declaration of Kathleen Duterte in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1470-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(dxf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Blackstone Consulting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny A. Scott
Represented By: Michael D. Singer
Represented By: Isam C Khoury
Represented By: Kristina A De La Rosa
Represented By: Rosemary Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Pankit J. Doshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?