Rivera v. Merchants Automotive Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miranda Korin Rivera
Defendant: Merchants Automotive Group Inc., Glenn L. Dyer, Jr., Fox Rent A Car Inc., Does 1 through 50 and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv01472
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Second Joint Motion to Continue ENE, CMC, and Related Dates Until After Motion to Dismiss Resolved (ECF No. #17 ). Joint Discovery Plan due 12/10/2021. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 11/3/21 are continued to 12/20/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/13/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Continue ENE, CMC, and Associated Dates (second) by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jmo).
October 11, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY - Other re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Miranda Korin Rivera. (Richardson, Gail) (jmo).
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jpp).
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. (Manahan, George) (jpp).
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Miranda Korin Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gail Richardson)(Richardson, Gail) (jpp).
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Miranda Korin Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gail Richardson)(Richardson, Gail) (jpp).
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gail Richardson on behalf of Miranda Korin Rivera (Richardson, Gail)Attorney Gail Richardson added to party Miranda Korin Rivera(pty:pla) (jpp).
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John H Everett on behalf of Fox Rent A Car Inc., Merchants Automotive Group Inc. (Everett, John)Attorney John H Everett added to party Fox Rent A Car Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John H Everett added to party Merchants Automotive Group Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Continue ENE, CMC, and related dates until after motion dismiss resolved. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference continued to 11/3/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/26/2021. (jpp)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue ENE, CMC, and Associated Dates Until After MTD Resolved by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manahan, George) (jpp).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/20/2021 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/19/2021.(jpp) (dlg).
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Campbell Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Manahan, George) (jpp).
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution of United States for Glenn L. Dyer Jr. by Glenn L. Dyer, Jr re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scope of Employment Certification, #2 Proof of Service)(Manahan, George) (sjt).
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Merchants Automotive Group Inc.(smd) (sjt).
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Fox Rent A Car Inc. (smd) (sjt).
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Glenn L. Dyer, Jr. (smd) (sjt).
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand, Fee Waived, filed by Glenn L. Dyer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Coversheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1472-L-BLM. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Merchants Automotive Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Korin Rivera
Represented By: Vy T. Nguyen
Represented By: Gail Walther Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Automotive Group Inc.
Represented By: John H Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn L. Dyer, Jr.
Represented By: George Vincent Manahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Rent A Car Inc.
Represented By: John H Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: George Vincent Manahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?