Walsh v. Premar Global Warehouse Logistics et al
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: Premar Global Warehouse Logistics sole proprietorship doing business as Premar, Export Dynamics De Mexico and Thomas Martinez Leal
Case Number: 3:2021cv01484
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 fl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and Order of Reference. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/27/2021.(jrm)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/25/2021.(jrm)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Granting Joint Motion to Approve Consent Decree (Doc. #4 ). Judge Berg will retain jurisdiction over all disputes arising between and among the parties out of this Decree or the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/26/21. (jmo)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(Ahumada, Adriana)(jrm).
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lodgment by Martin J. Walsh of Consent Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ahumada, Adriana) (jrm).
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Export Dynamics De Mexico, Thomas Martinez Leal, Premar Global Warehouse Logistics, No Fee Required, filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1484-W-MSB. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Ahumada, Adriana)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Premar Global Warehouse Logistics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Adriana Eugenia Ahumada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premar Global Warehouse Logistics sole proprietorship doing business as Premar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Export Dynamics De Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Martinez Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?