Singleton v. SDG&E, et al
Plaintiff: Raymonda Singleton
Defendant: SDG&E, Cox Internet, Allconnect, Housing Urban and Development, Steven Lee Properties, Navajo Bluffs, R.V. Management, Kaiser Hospital, California Medical Board and Bay Vista Housing Partners
Case Number: 3:2021cv01594
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Raymonda Singleton. A review of the USDC's docket reflects that the USDC has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has denied appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The USCA may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the USCA may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. (akr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 USCA Time Schedule Order as to #6 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Raymonda Singleton. (akr)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 21-56108 for #6 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Raymonda Singleton. (akr)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit by Raymonda Singleton as to #5 Clerk's Judgment. Fee not paid, IFP request attached. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Request to Waive Court Fees, #3 Attachments). (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that for the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend; 2. Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed IFP [Doc. No. #2 ] and Motion for Appointment of Counsel [Doc. No. #3 ] are DENIED AS MOOT; 3. The Court CERTIFIES that an IFP appeal from this order would be frivolous and therefore would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) Case Closed.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) Dismissing Civil Action as Frivolous and for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii); and (2)Denying Motions to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and to Appoint Counsel as Moot [Doc. Nos. #2 , #3 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/13/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Raymonda Singleton. (axc) (rmc).
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymonda Singleton. (axc) (rmc).
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allconnect, Bay Vista Housing Partners, California Medical Board, Cox Internet, Housing Urban and Development, Kaiser Hospital, Navajo Bluffs, R.V. Management, SDG&E, Steven Lee Properties, IFP Filed, filed by Raymonda Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1594-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(axc) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. SDG&E, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymonda Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDG&E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Internet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allconnect
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Urban and Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lee Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navajo Bluffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.V. Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Vista Housing Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?