Fallenstein v. PVH Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Cally Fallenstein
Defendant: PVH Corp., PVH Retail Stores LLC and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2021cv01690
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion to Enlarge Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants PVH Corp. and PVH Retail Stores LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is enlarged to and including 1/21/2022. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/16/2021. (jrm)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PVH Corp., PVH Retail Stores LLC. (Rappaport, Lary)(jrm).
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses by Cally Fallenstein (Carpenter, Todd)(jrm).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Enlarge Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants PVH Corp. and PVH Retail Stores LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is enlarged to and including 11/22/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/20/2021. (jrm)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by PVH Corp., PVH Retail Stores LLC. (Rappaport, Lary)Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party PVH Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport added to party PVH Retail Stores LLC(pty:dft) (jrm).
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cally Fallenstein. PVH Retail Stores LLC served. (Carpenter, Todd)(jrm).
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cally Fallenstein. PVH Corp. served. (Carpenter, Todd) (jrm).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-50, PVH Corp., PVH Retail Stores LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16173287). Filed by Cally Fallenstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Declaration)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1690-AJB-AGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Carpenter, Todd)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallenstein v. PVH Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cally Fallenstein
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVH Corp.
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVH Retail Stores LLC
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?