Oskouie v. Acro Service Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Pooya Oskouie
Defendant: Acro Service Corp. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2021cv01736
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Notice of Motion filed by Acro Service Corp.. (Disbrow, Matthew) (jrm).
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Fawn Bekam on behalf of Pooya Oskouie (Bekam, Fawn)Attorney Fawn Bekam added to party Pooya Oskouie(pty:pla) (jrm).
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Notice of Motion filed by Pooya Oskouie. (Bekam, Fawn) (jrm).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Notice of Motion : Responses due by 10/27/2021; Replies due by 11/3/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Counsel please note change of hearing date.(no document attached) (sc)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Acro Service Corp.. Amendment to #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Notice of Motion Amended Exhibit A. (Disbrow, Matthew) (jrm).
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Notice of Motion by Acro Service Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Alethea Brinkerhoff, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alethea Brinkerhoff)(Disbrow, Matthew)(jrm).
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acro Service Corp.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Disbrow, Matthew) (jrm).
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16199587.), filed by Acro Service Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew Disbrow with attachment of lower court documents, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Althea Brinkerhoff)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1736-AJB-AHG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (fth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oskouie v. Acro Service Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pooya Oskouie
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Campbell
Represented By: Fawn Bekam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acro Service Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?