Lobbin et al v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Lobbin and SML Avvocati P.C.
Defendant: Target Corporation and Kmart Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv01785
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
3 Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned per Minute Order of Recusal ECF. No. 3 . Case reassigned back to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21-cv-1785-TWR-JLB.(no document attached) (dsn)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:15-cv-01411-TWR-BLM. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01785-TWR-BLM. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/1/2021. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 11/30/2021.(jrm)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1785-AJB-JLB.(no document attached) (ggv)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Target Corporation, Kmart Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16229883.), filed by Stephen M. Lobbin, SML Avvocati P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1785-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Lobbin, Stephen)(axc) Modified on 10/20/2021 to correct filed date to date all documents received, NEF regenerated (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobbin et al v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Lobbin
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SML Avvocati P.C.
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmart Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?