Acuna v. Pollard et al
Plaintiff: Alex I. Acuna
Defendant: Marcus Pollard, M. Glenn, R. Vargas, C. Gipson, B. Hendricks, Howard Mosley, Steadman and S. Gates
Case Number: 3:2021cv01910
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 cv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Janis L. Sammartino to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez. All dates currently set before Judge Sammartino remain as scheduled before Judge Lopez. Dates before the Magistrate Judge are unaffected by this Order. The new case number is 21cv1910 LL (AGS). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 01/04/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jcj)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from California Northern District. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached)(jms)(jrd)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from the Northern District of California; Case Number 5:21-cv-08376-EJD. Original file received electronically.
November 9, 2021 Transferring case electronically to the Southern District of California. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/10/2021.]
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/8/2021. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/10/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alex I. Acuna. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/10/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. Glenn, Marcus Pollard, R. Vargas. Filed byAlex I. Acuna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuna v. Pollard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex I. Acuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?