Whaley et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Whaley and Magdalena Whaley
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2021cv01985
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Bradford B. Lear, re #12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/10/2022.(rmc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 16 PRO HAC APPROVED: Stephen E. Marshall appearing for Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (no document attached) (rmc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16464824.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Marshall, Stephen) (rmc).
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time [Doc.No. #13 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/29/2021. (dxf)
December 27, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Perkins, Roger) (dxf).
December 22, 2021 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16427625.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lear, Bradford) (rmc).
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (First Amended Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Andrew Whaley, Magdalena Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Redline comparing original Complaint with First Amended Complaint) (Meyer, Anthony) (dxf).
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing First Amended Complaint by Andrew Whaley, Magdalena Whaley re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Meyer, Anthony) (dxf).
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Meyer on behalf of Andrew Whaley, Magdalena Whaley (Meyer, Anthony)Attorney Anthony J. Meyer added to party Andrew Whaley(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony J. Meyer added to party Magdalena Whaley (pty:pla)(dxf).
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Je Yon Jung (Jung, Je Yon) (dxf).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Continue [Doc.No. #6 ]. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/8/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxf)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Continue Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Modified Briefing Schedule by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Perkins, Roger)Attorney Roger G. Perkins added to party Merck & Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Roger G. Perkins added to party Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(pty:dft) QC Mailer, re Proposed Orders should be emailed (dxf).
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Taylor, Carolyn) (dxf).
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Taylor, Carolyn) (dxf).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Taylor, Carolyn)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. (ggv)(jrd)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16349173.), filed by Andrew Whaley, Magdalena Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Request for Judicial Notice)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1985-H-BLM. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(ggv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whaley et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Whaley
Represented By: Je Yon Jung
Represented By: Anthony J. Meyer
Represented By: Bradford B. Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdalena Whaley
Represented By: Je Yon Jung
Represented By: Anthony J. Meyer
Represented By: Bradford B. Lear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Roger G. Perkins
Represented By: Stephen E. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Roger G. Perkins
Represented By: Stephen E. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?