Lee v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lee
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2022cv00153
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 wc Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kathleen Yates Landgraf on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Landgraf, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth Kathleen Yates Landgraf added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (jpp).
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Parker on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine L. Parker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Kenneth Lee. (ave)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt)(jrd)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Daniel E. Butcher has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent / declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (cxt)(Main Document 2 replaced on 2/3/2022; NEF regenerated.)(cxt)(jrd)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16532594.), filed by Kenneth Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-153-DEB. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is assigned to the case. (Martha Yancey)(cxt)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lee
Represented By: Martha W. Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Elizabeth Kathleen Yates Landgraf
Represented By: Katherine L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?