Upshaw v. Chau et al
Plaintiff: John William Upshaw
Defendant: Dr. John Chau and Marcus Pollard
Case Number: 3:2022cv00183
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jinsook Ohta
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Plaintiff's NOTICE to Court of intention to proceed with Eighth Amendment claim against Dr. Chau only re #4 and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John William Upshaw. (smy1)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Screening Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) & 1915A(b). The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 3/1/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(axc)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John William Upshaw. (smy1)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John William Upshaw. (smy1)(jms).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Chau, Marcus Pollard (Filing fee $402, fee not paid, IFP filed.), filed by John William Upshaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-183-JO-BGS. Judge Ohta, Jinsook and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (smy1) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upshaw v. Chau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John William Upshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?