Dwyer v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Dwyer
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., Beauty in Heart and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2022cv00431
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC") - TIME CHANGE ONLY. The ENE and CMC set for 6/13/2022 at 2:30 PM are reset for 2:00 PM on the same date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 5/24/2022.(no document attached) (hmw)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC"). Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the ENE and CMC originally scheduled for 6/14/2022 are RESET for 6/13/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. No deadlines were modified in making this change. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 5/19/2022.(hmw)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") and Case Management Conference ("CMC"). ENE set for 6/14/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, the Court will immediately thereafter hold a CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/8/2022.(hmw)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc..(Hussey, Julie) (anh).
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charlotte Dwyer. (Luneau, Thomas)(jrm).
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Beauty in Heart, Other Affiliate Plaintiff Charlotte Dwyer for Amazon.com, Inc. (Hussey, Julie)(jrm).
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com, Inc. (Hussey, Julie) (jrm).
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16701232.), filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-431-AJB-AHG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(cxt)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwyer v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Dwyer
Represented By: Jeremy K. Robinson
Represented By: Thomas D Luneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Julie L. Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty in Heart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?