Bueno et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Bueno and Richard Parker
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Organon & Co., Oragnon LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2022cv00522
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
2 Judge: M James Lorenz
3 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER: The Court, pursuant to its discretion under Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), determines that the Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. No. #6 ) is fit for resolution without oral argument and submits the motion on the parties' papers. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing on the motion scheduled for June 6, 2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 05/24/2022.(no document attached) (rlw)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Oragnon LLC, Organon & Co.. (Romano, Julia) (jms).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kimberly Lewis Beck, re #12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/20/2022.(rmc)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16818205.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Beck, Kimberly) (rmc).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing Date and Briefing Deadline. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/12/2022. (jms)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Continue Reply Deadline and Hearing Date for Defendants' Pending Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Oragnon LLC, Organon & Co.. (Romano, Julia) (jms).
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Zumsteg on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Oragnon LLC, Organon & Co. (Zumsteg, Amy)Attorney Amy Zumsteg added to party Merck & Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Zumsteg added to party Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Zumsteg added to party Oragnon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Zumsteg added to party Organon & Co.(pty:dft) (jms).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Spencer Bueno, Richard Parker. (Bhujwala, Shehnaz) (fth).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge M. James Lorenz, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:21-cv-01985-H-BLM. The new case number is 22cv522-H-BLM. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/3/2022. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/2/2022.(fth)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Oragnon LLC, Organon & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Request for Judicial Notice, #18 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Carolyn) (fth).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander G. Calfo on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Oragnon LLC, Organon & Co. (Calfo, Alexander)Attorney Alexander G. Calfo added to party Merck & Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander G. Calfo added to party Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander G. Calfo added to party Oragnon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander G. Calfo added to party Organon & Co.(pty:dft) (fth).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Elizabeth Romano on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Oragnon LLC, Organon & Co. (Romano, Julia)Attorney Julia Elizabeth Romano added to party Merck & Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julia Elizabeth Romano added to party Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Julia Elizabeth Romano added to party Oragnon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Julia Elizabeth Romano added to party Organon & Co.(pty:dft) (fth).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Spencer Bueno, Richard Parker of case(s) 3:21-cv-01985-H-BLM . (Bhujwala, Shehnaz) Proposed LNO Created (fth).
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Oragnon LLC, Organon & Co. identifying Corporate Parent Schering Plough Corporation for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp... (sjt)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16744129.), filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon & Co., Oragnon LLC, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Request for Judicial Notice)The new case number is 3:22-cv-522-L-JLB. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(sjt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2022: #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bueno et al v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Bueno
Represented By: Kevin P Roddy
Represented By: Shehnaz Maneck Bhujwala
Represented By: Kimberly Lewis Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Parker
Represented By: Kevin P Roddy
Represented By: Shehnaz Maneck Bhujwala
Represented By: Kimberly Lewis Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Roger G. Perkins
Represented By: Amy Zumsteg
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Alexander G. Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Roger G. Perkins
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Amy Zumsteg
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Alexander G. Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organon & Co.
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Roger G. Perkins
Represented By: Amy Zumsteg
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Alexander G. Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oragnon LLC
Represented By: Carolyn Taylor
Represented By: Roger G. Perkins
Represented By: Amy Zumsteg
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Alexander G. Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?