Tirgari v. Kazemipour et al
Plaintiff: Reza Tirgari
Defendant: Reza Kazemipour, 1792 Partners Inc., 1792 Partners General Partnership and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2022cv00541
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
2 Judge: David D Leshner
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs RICO claim against Kazemipour is DISMISSED because Plaintiff does not allege that Kazemipours actions constituted a pattern under RICO. Plaintiffs DTSA claim against both Defendants is DISMISSED because Plaintiff has failed to adequately plead that the information Defendants allegedly misappropriated were actual trade secrets. Because both federal claims in this case are dismissed, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the SAC is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff pursuing the state law claims in state court. Case Closed.(anh)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. #16 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/15/2022. (anh)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order on Ex Parte Application for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/12/2022. (exs)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Reza Tirgari. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Whitman, Charles) (anh).
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reza Kazemipour. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daryoosh Khashayar in Support to the Reply, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Khashayar, Daryoosh) (anh).
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reza Kazemipour. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of service)(Khashayar, Daryoosh) (anh).
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Amended Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 1792 Partners Inc. (anh)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 1792 Partners Inc. (anh)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against 1792 Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles F. Whitman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Whitman, Charles) (anh).
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reza Tirgari. 1792 Partners Inc. served. (Whitman, Charles) (anh).
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Reza Tirgari. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles F. Whitman ISO Opposition to Motion to Dismiss SAC, #2 Objection and Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint)(Whitman, Charles) (anh).
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Reza Kazemipour. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration Of Daryoosh Khashayar in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #4 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Khashayar, Daryoosh) (anh).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Re: Joint Motion to File Second Amended Complaint [Doc. Nos. #9 , #13 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/13/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 1792 Partners Inc., Reza Kazemipour, filed by Reza Tirgari. (Marxen, Marissa) (anh).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint by Reza Tirgari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Marxen, Marissa)Attorney Marissa Christina Marxen added to party Reza Tirgari(pty:pla) (anh).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reza Tirgari. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles F. Whitman, #2 Exhibit 1)(Whitman, Charles) (anh).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: On August 26, 2022, counsel for defendants filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for defendants 1792 Partners, Inc. and 1792 Parnters GP, LLP, stating that those are now defunct business entities. [Doc. No. #10 .] For GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, the motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Daryoosh Khashayar, Esq., of Khashaayar Law Group, is HEREBY TERMINATED as counsel for defendants 1792 Partners, Inc. and 1792 Partners GP, LLP. Mr. Khashayar shall remain as counsel for defendant Reza Kazemipour. (anh)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of defendants 1792 partners, inc, and 1792 partners gp, llp, only by 1792 Partners Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Khashayar, Daryoosh)Attorney Daryoosh Khashayar added to party 1792 Partners Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Reza Kazemipour. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities MPA, #2 Request for Judicial Notice RJN, #3 Declaration DEC, #4 Proof of Service POS)(Khashayar, Daryoosh) (anh).
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22-cv-00541-CAB-DDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/16/2022.(anh)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: On April 19, 2022, Plaintiff Reza Tirgari filed a complaint alleging a claim under 18 U.S.C. 1962(c) (RICO), as well as various state law claims. [Doc. No. #1 .] On July 6, 2022, Defendants Reza Kazemipour, 1792 Partners, Inc., and 1792 Partners GP LLP (collectively Defendants), filed a motion to dismiss the complaint. [Doc. No. 5.]On July 27, 2022, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint. [Doc. No. 6.] Having elected to file an amended pleading as a matter of right pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Pro 15(a)(1)(B), the motion to dismiss [Doc. No. 5] is HEREBY DENIED AS MOOT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants shall have until August 19, 2022 to respond to the First Amended Complaint. (anh)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial against 1792 Partners General Partnership, 1792 Partners Inc., Reza Kazemipour, filed by Reza Tirgari. (Whitman, Charles)(anh).
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Reza Kazemipour. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Khashayar, Daryoosh)Attorney Daryoosh Khashayar added to party Reza Kazemipour(pty:dft) (anh).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reza Tirgari. Reza Kazemipour served. (Whitman, Charles) (anh).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reza Tirgari. 1792 Partners General Partnership, 1792 Partners Inc., Reza Kazemipour served. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed - 1792 Partners, Inc., #2 Summons Returned Executed - 1792 General Partners)(Whitman, Charles) (anh).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1792 Partners General Partnership, 1792 Partners Inc., Reza Kazemipour ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CCASDC-16753374). Filed by Reza Tirgari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:22-cv-541-CAB-DEB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Adkins, Brian)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tirgari v. Kazemipour et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reza Tirgari
Represented By: Brian Curtis Perttula Adkins
Represented By: Charles F. Whitman
Represented By: Marissa Christina Marxen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza Kazemipour
Represented By: Daryoosh Khashayar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1792 Partners Inc.
Represented By: Daryoosh Khashayar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1792 Partners General Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?