Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. NXP USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bell Semiconductor, LLC
Defendant: NXP USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00594
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. #32 ) and Requiring Interim Status Reports. Case stayed until pending the final decision in ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-1319. Parties to file a joint status report no later than 12/21/22, and to file a joint status report every six months thereafter until ITC Investigation No. 337-TA-1319 has concluded. Parties to file a joint status report within ten (10) days after the ITC issues its final decision in Investigation No. 337-TA-1319. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/21/22. (jmo)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NXP USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NXP Semiconductors N.V., Corporate Parent NXP B.V., Corporate Parent Freescale Semiconductor Holdings V, Inc. for NXP USA, Inc... (Corr, Steven) (dlg).
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion for Mandatory Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659 Pending ITC Investigation by NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Corr, Steven)Attorney Steven J. Corr added to party NXP USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of David Sochia, re #25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ashley N. Moore, re #24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard A. Kamprath, re #26 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alexandra Easley, re #27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/7/2022.(rmc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889750.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Easley, Alexandra) (rmc).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889740.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kamprath, Richard) (rmc).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889720.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sochia, David) (rmc).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16889695.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Moore, Ashley) (rmc).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion to extend Defendant's deadline to respond. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/20/2022. (jpp)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Bell Semiconductor, LLC . (Wiener, Seth) (jmo).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Wiener, Seth) (jmo).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER #22 **NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Bell Semiconductor, LLC . (Wiener, Seth) **QC mailer 5/19/2022 re: incorrect PDF attached. (jmo). Modified on 5/19/2022 (jmo).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER #22 ** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiener, Seth) **QC mailer re not filing proposed orders on docket and send copy of order to chambers. Instructed to withdraw if filed in error. Missing joint signature** (jmo). Modified on 5/19/2022 to withdraw (jmo).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of David Sochia, re #14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/17/2022.(rmc)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ashley N. Moore, re #13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/17/2022.(rmc)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard A. Kamprath, re #12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/17/2022.(rmc)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alexandra Easley, re #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/17/2022.(rmc)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sochia, David) (rmc).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Moore, Ashley) (rmc).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kamprath, Richard) (rmc).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Easley, Alexandra) (rmc).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827605.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sochia, David) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827587.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Moore, Ashley) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827572.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kamprath, Richard) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc).
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16827550.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Easley, Alexandra) QC mail sent - filed in incorrect case (rmc).
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. NXP USA, Inc. served. (Wiener, Seth) (jmo).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv594-BAS-KSC.(no document attached) (ddf)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt)(jrd)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell Semiconductor, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilco Patent Acquisition 56, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco IP Merchant Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilco, Inc. for Bell Semiconductor, LLC.. (cxt)(jrd)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s): 7,007,259 B2 (cc: USPTO)(cxt)(jrd)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against NXP USA, Inc. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16776473.), filed by Bell Semiconductor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Filing of Patent Action, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)The new case number is 3:22-cv-594-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Seth W. Wiener)(cxt)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell Semiconductor, LLC v. NXP USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bell Semiconductor, LLC
Represented By: Alan Peter Block
Represented By: Seth W. Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?