Sarcuni et al v. bZx DAO et al
Plaintiff: Christian Sarcuni, Pedro Cunha, Alexander Lloyd, Marc Simon, Pilici Rustam, Daniel Lu, Clment Omtek, Edison Ho, Paolo Leite, Miras Issakhov, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Mannu Singh and Simon Schmid
Defendant: bZx DAO, Kyle Kistner, Tom Bean, Hashed International LLC, Age Crypto LLC, Ooki DAO, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC and AGE Crypto GP LLC
Counter Defendant: Skliar Viktor, Kiro Aleksandrov, Jonas Wernecke, Daniele Penna, Clement Ometek and Marc-Julien Lie
Case Number: 3:2022cv00618
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STATUS REPORT re: Discovery Schedule by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke. (Harrow, Jason) (rmc).
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Minutes and Order Setting Continued Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference ("ENE/CMC"): The Court held an ENE/CMC on 6/28/2023. The Zoom ENE/CMC is continued to 7/18/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. By close of business 7/14/2023 the parties shall submit via email to efile_butcher@casd.uscourts.gov an updated Joint Discovery Plan, settlement briefs, and revised participant lists if there are any changes from the participants on 6/28/2023. (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Harrow; Charles Gerstein).(Defendant Attorney Jason Gottlieb; Daniel Isaacs; Michael Gleason; Kayvan Sadeghi; Elizabeth Baldridge; Adam Garson; Marc Ehrlich). (no document attached) (smd)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reif, Brandon) (rmc).
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Joint Discovery Plan. (Harrow, Jason) Modified on 6/22/2023, QC mail sent re incorrect event (rmc).
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher:Status Conference re upcoming ENE/CMC held on 6/15/2023. (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Harrow; Charles Gerstein).(Defendant Attorney Daniel Isaacs; Jason Gottlieb; Michael Gleason; Elizabeth Baldridge; Kayvan Sadeghi; Adam Garson; Marc Ehrlich). (no document attached) (smd)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PRO HAC APPROVED: Kayvan B. Sadeghi appearing for Defendant Hashed International LLC (no document attached) (jrm)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sadeghi, Kayvan)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Garson on behalf of Hashed International LLC (Garson, Adam)Attorney Adam S. Garson added to party Hashed International LLC(pty:dft) (rmc).
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Stuart Ehrlich on behalf of AGE Crypto GP LLC (Ehrlich, Marc)Attorney Marc Stuart Ehrlich added to party AGE Crypto GP LLC(pty:dft) (rmc).
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ANSWER to #54 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke.(Gerstein, Charles)Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Kiro Aleksandrov(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Pedro Cunha(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Edison Ho(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Miras Issakhov(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Paolo Leite(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Marc-Julien Lie(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Marc-Julien Lie(pty:pla), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Alexander Lloyd(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Daniel Lu(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Shuai Lu(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Sooraj Narayanan(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Clement Ometek(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Daniele Penna(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Pilici Rustam(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Christian Sarcuni(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Simon Schmid(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Marc Simon(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Mannu Singh(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Skliar Viktor(pty:cd), Attorney Charles Lewis Gerstein added to party Jonas Wernecke(pty:cd) Courtesy QC mail sent re filer not matching signature (rmc).
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. A telephonic Status Conference re: the scheduled Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference is set for 6/15/2023 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Counsel must call the Court's teleconference line at 1-888-398-2342, enter access code 8389272, and press * if prompted for a security code. Only counsel are required to participate in the Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 5/12/2023.(no document attached) (smd)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE Eegarding ENE by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke (Harrow, Jason)(jms).
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Approving #53 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/27/2023.( Attorney Brandon S. Reif terminated for Defendant Hashed International LLC) (rmc)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Counsel and party representatives must appear for an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in this case on 6/28/2023 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will hold a Case Management Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) immediately following the conclusion of the ENE. A Joint Discovery Plan must be filed on the CM/ECF system no later than 6/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 4/26/2023.(rmc)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kayvan Sadeghi, re #55 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/25/2023.(rmc)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Charles Lewis Gerstein, re #35 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/3/2023.(rmc)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PRO HAC APPROVED: Alexandra Wan Wang appearing for Defendant Kyle Kistner (no document attached) (jrm)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17791727.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Wang, Alexandra)(jrm).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, by AGE Crypto GP LLC.(Reif, Brandon) Courtesy QC mail sent - not signed by filer (rmc).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, Defendant Hashed International LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses in Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Hashed International LLC.(Baldridge, Elizabeth) (rmc).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17788677.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sadeghi, Kayvan) (rmc).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ANSWER to #21 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Kyle Kistner.(Gleason, Michael) (rmc).
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Hashed International LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baldridge, Elizabeth) QC mail sent re motion filed as notice, e-filed proposed order (rmc).
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Holland Baldridge on behalf of Hashed International LLC (Baldridge, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth Holland Baldridge added to party Hashed International LLC(pty:dft) (rmc).
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Extending #50 Time to Answer. Defendants Kistner, Hashed International LLC, and Age Crypto LLC shall answer the FAC by 4/24/2023. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/7/2023. (rmc)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint by Kyle Kistner. (Gleason, Michael) (rmc).
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying in Part and Granting in Part #27 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #27 Motion to Strike; and Denying #31 Motion to Dismiss. To the extent Plaintiffs wish to amend their claims, they may do so by filing a Second Amended Complaint by 4/10/2023, in accordance with the Southern District's Civil Local Rules and this Court's Civil Standing Order. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/27/2023. (rmc)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE re #47 Notice (Other), filed by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke. (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Tom Bean, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, in the Alternative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Johnson Order)(Gleason, Michael)(jms).
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE re #45 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Authority filed by Tom Bean, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC. (Gleason, Michael)(ave).
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order of ND Cal in CFTC v. Ooki DAO)(Harrow, Jason) (jms).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying Motion To Modify Briefing Schedule [Dkt. #37 ]. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/6/2022. (ddf)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, in the Alternative filed by Tom Bean, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC. (Gleason, Michael) (jms).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by AGE Crypto GP LLC, Hashed International LLC. (Reif, Brandon)(jms).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by AGE Crypto GP LLC, Hashed International LLC. (Reif, Brandon) qc mailer sent re not signed document and appears to be duplicate of #42 (jms).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: Currently on calendar for Monday, October 11, 2022, at 11:15 a.m. are hearings on Defendants Kyle Kistner, Tom Bean, Leveragebox LLC, and bZeroX LLCs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, or, in the alternative, to Strike Plaintiffs Class Allegations, (Dkt. #27 ); and Defendants Hashed International LLC and AGE Crypto GP LLCS Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, (Dkt. #31 ). Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), the Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on October 11, 2022.(jms)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition Memorandum And to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by Tom Bean, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC. (Gleason, Michael) (jms).
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice of Complaint and Order)(Harrow, Jason) (jms).
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition Memorandum And to Modify Briefing Schedule by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Proposed Order) QC mailer sent re attached proposed order (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, in the Alternative filed by Kiro Aleksandrov, Pedro Cunha, Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn, Edison Ho, Miras Issakhov, Paolo Leite, Marc-Julien Lie, Alexander Lloyd, Daniel Lu, Shuai Lu, Sooraj Narayanan, Clement Ometek, Daniele Penna, Pilici Rustam, Christian Sarcuni, Simon Schmid, Marc Simon, Mannu Singh, Skliar Viktor, Jonas Wernecke. (Harrow, Jason)(jms).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17141615.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Gerstein, Charles)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, in the Alternative, #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, in the Alternative Responses due by 9/13/2022 Replies due by 10/4/2022.. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 8/2/2022. (jms)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hashed International LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hashed Inc. for Hashed International LLC.. (Reif, Brandon) (jms).
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AGE Crypto GP LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reif, Brandon) (jms).
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by AGE Crypto GP LLC, Hashed International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Defendants Hashed International LLC and AGE Crypto GP LLC's Motion To Dismiss The First Amended Complaint)(Reif, Brandon) (jms).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, in the Alternative by Tom Bean, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC. (Gleason, Michael) (jms).
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by bZeroX LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Gleason, Michael) (fth).
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leveragebox LLC identifying Corporate Parent BZX Holding Corporation for Leveragebox LLC.. (Gleason, Michael) (fth).
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint, in the Alternative by Tom Bean, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of J. Gottlieb, #3 Exhibit 1 thru 3)(Gleason, Michael) (fth).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jason Philip Gottlieb, Daniel C. Isaacs appearing for Defendants Tom Bean, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, bZeroX LLC (no document attached) (rmc)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16965571.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Isaacs, Daniel) (rmc).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16965529.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gottlieb, Jason) (rmc).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Added attorney Michael J. Gleason for Tom Bean, Michael J. Gleason for Kyle Kistner, Michael J. Gleason for Leveragebox LLC, Michael J. Gleason for bZeroX LLC. Attorney Michael Gregory Freedman terminated. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/1/2022.(smy1)(jrd)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying #20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File as Moot; Setting Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/30/2022. (jms)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd. (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint by Hashed International LLC, AGE Crypto GP LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Extending Time To Respond To Initial Complaint)(Reif, Brandon)Attorney Brandon S. Reif added to party Hashed International LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brandon S. Reif added to party AGE Crypto GP LLC(pty:dft)qc mailer sent re attached proposed order (jms).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Mahnoor Misbah, re #14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/1/2022.(rmc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Daniel C. Isaacs, re #13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/1/2022.(rmc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jason P. Gottlieb, re #12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/1/2022.(rmc)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/1/2022. (jms)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16869799.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Misbah, Mahnoor)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16868424.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Misbah, Mahnoor) (rmc).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16867418.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Isaacs, Daniel) (rmc).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16867338.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gottlieb, Jason) (rmc).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by bZeroX LLC, Leveragebox LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freedman, Michael)Attorney Michael Gregory Freedman added to party bZeroX LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Gregory Freedman added to party bZx DAO(pty:dft) qc mailer sent re attached proposed order (jms).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd, as to Kyle Kistner. (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd, as to Tom Bean. (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd. Hashed International LLC served. (Harrow, Jason)(jms).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd. Age Crypto LLC served. (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd. Leveragebox LLC served. (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd. bZeroX LLC served. (Harrow, Jason) (jms).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv618-LAB-DEB.(no document attached) (ddf)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Age Crypto LLC, Tom Bean, Hashed International LLC, Kyle Kistner, Leveragebox LLC, Ooki DAO, bZeroX LLC, bZx DAO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16784443.), filed by Pilici Rustam, Jonas Wernecke, Skliar Viktor, Edison Ho, Christian Sarcuni, Paolo Leite, Daniel Lu, Miras Issakhov, Daniele Penna, Pedro Cunha, Marc Simon, Clement Ometek, Kiro Aleksandrov, Alexander Lloyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-618-BEN-DEB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Harrow, Jason)(ggv) (sjt). Modified on 5/3/2022 to update party name (ggv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarcuni et al v. bZx DAO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Sarcuni
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Cunha
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Lloyd
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Simon
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilici Rustam
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lu
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clment Omtek
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edison Ho
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paolo Leite
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miras Issakhov
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuai Lu
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sooraj Narayanan
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hctor Albert Gonzlez Terrn
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mannu Singh
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Schmid
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Skliar Viktor
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kiro Aleksandrov
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jonas Wernecke
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Daniele Penna
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Clement Ometek
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Marc-Julien Lie
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Charles Lewis Gerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bZx DAO
Represented By: Michael Gregory Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Kistner
Represented By: Alexandra Wan Wang
Represented By: Daniel C. Isaacs
Represented By: Jason Philip Gottlieb
Represented By: Michael J. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bean
Represented By: Daniel C. Isaacs
Represented By: Jason Philip Gottlieb
Represented By: Michael J. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hashed International LLC
Represented By: Brandon S. Reif
Represented By: Elizabeth Holland Baldridge
Represented By: Kayvan B. Sadeghi
Represented By: Adam S. Garson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Age Crypto LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ooki DAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leveragebox LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Isaacs
Represented By: Jason Philip Gottlieb
Represented By: Michael J. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bZeroX LLC
Represented By: Michael Gregory Freedman
Represented By: Daniel C. Isaacs
Represented By: Jason Philip Gottlieb
Represented By: Michael J. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGE Crypto GP LLC
Represented By: Brandon S. Reif
Represented By: Marc Stuart Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?