Nunez et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Erika Nunez and Hector Garcia
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2022cv00625
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve B Chu
Referring Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
4 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 9/12/2023. (sjt)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Hector Garcia, Erika Nunez (Dolin, Tionna) (jms).
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Elizabeth A. LaRocque on behalf of Hector Garcia, Erika Nunez (LaRocque, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth A. LaRocque added to party Hector Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A. LaRocque added to party Erika Nunez(pty:pla) (jms).
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Karyn L. Ihara on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Ihara, Karyn)Attorney Karyn L. Ihara added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jms).
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv625-AGS(SBC).(no document attached) (rmc)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv625-AGS-BGS.(no document attached) (jms)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22CV625-AGS-NLS. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 3/16/2023.(jpp)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Ford Motor Company re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Maclear, Amy) (jpp).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Maclear, Amy)(jpp).
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Hector Garcia, Erika Nunez. (Law, Daniel) (jpp).
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Law on behalf of Hector Garcia, Erika Nunez (Law, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Law added to party Hector Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Law added to party Erika Nunez(pty:pla) (jpp).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Maclear, Amy) (jpp).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ford Motor Company, filed by Erika Nunez, Hector Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Dolin, Tionna) (jpp).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: (1) Denying as moot #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and (2) Granting #7 Joint Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to file First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 9/6/2022. (jpp)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend (Stipulation) by Hector Garcia, Erika Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint - Blackline)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)Attorney Ariel S. Harman-Holmes added to party Hector Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel S. Harman-Holmes added to party Erika Nunez(pty:pla) (jpp).
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Declaration of Amy Maclear ISO Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Maclear, Amy) (jpp).
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 7/25/2022. (jpp)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ford Motor Company. (Maclear, Amy)Attorney Amy Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jpp).
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erika Nunez, Hector Garcia. Ford Motor Company served. (Dolin, Tionna) (jpp).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 through 10, Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $402 - receipt number ACASDC-16793517), filed by Erika Nunez, Hector Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2018 Ford Focus Express Warranty)The new case number is 3:22-cv-625-RBM-NLS. Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Dolin, Tionna)(jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Nunez
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel Law
Represented By: Elizabeth A. LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Garcia
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel Law
Represented By: Elizabeth A. LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Amy Maclear
Represented By: Karyn L. Ihara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?