Smith v. Voxx, LLC
Plaintiff: Rodney Smith
Defendant: Voxx, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00649
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Todd W Robinson
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rodney Smith without prejudice (Rollin, Matthew) (fth).
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISCHARGING THE COURT'S MAY 10, 2022 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (ECF No. #4 ). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 5/13/2022. (fth)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, filed by Rodney Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew L. Rollin, #2 Exhibit 1 - Assignment, #3 Declaration of Jonah A. Grossbardt)(Rollin, Matthew)(ave).
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Plaintiff's Counsel to Show Cause (1) Why Action Should Not Be Transferred for Lack of Proper Venue to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, Western Division Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 84(c)(2), 1391(b), and 1406(a); and (2) Why They Should Not Be Sanctioned. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 5/10/2022. (fth)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt)(jrd)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rodney Smith. No Corporate Parents / Interested Parties. (cxt)(jrd)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Wwith Jury Demand Against Voxx, LLC (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16807397.), filed by Rodney Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Report Form) [Copyright Report Mailed] The new case number is 3:22-cv-649-TWR-BGS. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Matthew L. Rollin)(cxt)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Voxx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Smith
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Rollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voxx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?