Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2022cv00658
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Todd W Robinson
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on Objection (ECF 6 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 7/8/2022. (fth)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference Opposition to Defendant's Objection to Notice to Attend Hearing or Trial filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (fth).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (AGS): The objection (ECF 6 ) is taken under advisement. By June 24, 2022, plaintiff must file a response. By July 5, 2022, John Doe may file any reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 6/16/2022.(no document attached) (rfb) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (yeb). Modified on 7/8/2022 (fth).
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Early Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/20/2022. (fth)
May 19, 2022 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (fth).
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mef)(jrd)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (mef)(jrd)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against John Doe (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16811822.)filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet, #2 exhibit, #3 financial interest, #4 report) [Copyright Report Mailed]The new case number is 3:22-cv-658-TWR-AGS. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(Bandlow, Lincoln)(mef)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D. Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?