United States of America v. Estate of Tom L. Meyer et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Estate of Tom L. Meyer, Cynthia L. Meyer, Bradley A. Meyer, Chad M. Meyer, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive, LLC, Ocean Terrance Owners Association, The State of California Franchise Tax Board, County of San Diego, Treasurer and Ocean Terrace Owners Association
Case Number: 3:2022cv00727
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Robert S Huie
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 IRS: Action to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ocean Terrace Owners Association re #10 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #9 Answer to Amended Complaint (Jones, Rian) (ave).
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ocean Terrace Owners Association re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Jones, Rian) (ave).
July 15, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint filed by Ocean Terrance Owners Association, Ocean Terrace Owners Association.(Jones, Rian)Attorney Rian W. Jones added to party Ocean Terrance Owners Association(pty:dft)(ave).
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Granting Joint Motion To Extend Deadline For Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Phh Mortgage Corporation, And Western Progressive, Llc To Respond To Complaint - Deutsche Bank National Trust Company answer due 8/11/2022; PHH Mortgage Corporation answer due 8/11/2022; Western Progressive, LLC answer due 8/11/2022. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 7/11/2022. (ave)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, and Joint Stipulation by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Curran, Jarlath)Attorney Jarlath M. Curran added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft)(ave).
July 6, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by The State of California Franchise Tax Board.(Siegel, Kara)Attorney Kara D. Siegel added to party The State of California Franchise Tax Board (pty:dft) QC Mailer sent per wrong Judges intitals in caption (ave).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert S. Huie for all further proceedings. The new case number is 3:22-cv-00727-RSH-AGS. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 6/22/2022.(anh)
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (anh)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.New Summons Requested. (Darmstadter, Henry) (anh).
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv) (sjt).
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Estate of Tom L. Meyer, Bradley A. Meyer, Chad M. Meyer, Cynthia L. Meyer, Ocean Terrance Owners Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation, The State of California Franchise Tax Board, Western Progressive, LLC, No Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-727-CAB-AGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Darmstadter, Henry)(ggv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Estate of Tom L. Meyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry C Darmstadter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Tom L. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jarlath M. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Terrance Owners Association
Represented By: Rian W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California Franchise Tax Board
Represented By: Kara D. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego, Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Terrace Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?