Martinez v. Public Consulting Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Martinez
Defendant: Public Consulting Group, Inc. and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2022cv00813
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lm Removal- Labor/Mgmt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by Public Consulting Group, Inc.. (Gonell, Carrie) (ave).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Public Consulting Group, Inc. answer due 8/15/2022.. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/12/2022. (ave)
July 8, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Public Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Govea, Joseph) (ave).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/5/2022. (ave)
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lisa Martinez. (Connolly, Kristy) (axc).
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lisa Martinez, filed by Lisa Martinez. (Connolly, Kristy)(ave).
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court by Lisa Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Connolly, Kristy)Attorney Kristy Rose Connolly added to party Lisa Martinez(pty:pla) (anh).
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Public Consulting Group, Inc.. (Gonell, Carrie) (ave).
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand , filed by Public Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Gonell, Carrie) (ave).
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Public Consulting Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Public Consulting Group LLC, Corporate Parent Public Consulting Group Holdings, Inc. for Public Consulting Group, Inc. (ggv)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16878854.), filed by Public Consulting Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" to Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court)The new case number is 3:22-cv-813-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(ggv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Public Consulting Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Martinez
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Campbell
Represented By: Kashif Haque
Represented By: Samuel Alan Wong
Represented By: Kristy Rose Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie Anne Gonell
Represented By: Joseph A. Govea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?