Morrison et al v. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Morrison, Kellie Valencia and Karie Kuehl
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Alza Corporation, Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janseen Ortho LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Dr. C. Lowell Parsons, MD and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2022cv01074
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Denying Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Expedited Briefing Schedule; Setting Briefing Schedule for the Defendants' Motion to Stay; and Resetting Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand (ECF Nos. #8 , #9 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/2/2022. (jrm)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #11 ). Defendants' last day to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall set for 30 days following the JPMLs decision on the Motion to Vacate the Conditional Transfer Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/29/22.(jmo)
August 30, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #8 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for an Expedited Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; Declaration of Matthew K. Ashby filed by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Ashby, Matthew) (jmo).
August 29, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for an Expedited Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; Declaration of Matthew K. Ashby filed by Karie Kuehl, Melissa Morrison, Kellie Valencia. (Rodriguez, Christopher) (jmo).
August 29, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Stipulation and Order re Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Ashby, Matthew) 2 (jmo). Modified on 8/31/2022 (jmo).
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Expedited Briefing Schedule (ECF No. #8 ). Any opposition shall be filed on or before Monday, 8/29/2022. Any reply shall be filed on or before Wednesday, 8/31/2022. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/25/22.(jmo)
August 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Karie Kuehl, Melissa Morrison, Kellie Valencia. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Melissa Morrison, #3 Declaration of Karie Kuehl)(Rodriguez, Christopher) (jmo).
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for an Expedited Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; Declaration of Matthew K. Ashby by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ashby, Matthew) (jmo).
August 18, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Ruling By The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew K. Ashby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ashby, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Kenneth Ashby added to party Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft) (jmo).
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #5 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/1/2022. (jrm)
July 29, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Romano, Julia)(jrm).
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re #3 Notice of Related Case, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, #1 Notice of Removal,, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Romano, Julia)(jrm).
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. of case(s) 20-md-02973 re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Romano, Julia)(jrm).
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. for Alza Corporation, Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson. (Romano, Julia)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 - receipt number ACASDC-17017075), filed by Janseen Ortho LLC, Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Alza Corporation, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1074-GPC-MSB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison et al v. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Global Respiratory Research, LLC
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alza Corporation
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janseen Ortho LLC
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Ashby
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. C. Lowell Parsons, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Morrison
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Bluth
Represented By: Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Valencia
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Bluth
Represented By: Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karie Kuehl
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Bluth
Represented By: Christopher Ross Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?