Murdoch v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer Murdoch
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv01619
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
2 Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Video Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/9/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/13/2022.(cxl1)
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Tsui, Karen) (cxl1).
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. (Tsui, Karen) (cxl1).
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Tsui, Karen)Attorney Karen T. Tsui added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (cxl1).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is December 14, 2022. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/9/2022. (fth)
November 8, 2022 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, --- Joint Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company to Respond to Complaint --- by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Murray, Misty)Attorney Misty Murray added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (fth).
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv1619-L-MDD.(no document attached) (cxl1)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv1619-W-MDD.(no document attached) (ddf)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Murdoch. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served. (Iler, Virgil) (ddf).
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl1) (rmc).
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17271118.), filed by Jennifer Murdoch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1619-BEN-MDD. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Iler, Virgil)(cxl1) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murdoch v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Murdoch
Represented By: Brooks L Iler
Represented By: Virgil Adam Iler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen T. Tsui
Represented By: Misty Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?