Arability IP LLC v. Sony Electronics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arability IP LLC
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc and Mavexar LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01633
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice and Order for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/8/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Status Conference set for 1/30/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/29/22.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
November 14, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sony Electronics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gewirtz, Gregory) (jmo).
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #23 ). Sony's deadline to respond to Arability's complaint is 11/11/22. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/4/22. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
November 1, 2022 Filing 23 Joint MOTION TO SET RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE re #1 Complaint by Arability IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Ritcheson, Steven) **QC mailer to not submit proposed orders on the docket and to send to Chambers on 11/2/2022** (jmo). **2nd Notice QC mailer to send proposed order to Chambers 11/4/2022** (jmo).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of David R. Bennett, re #17 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/26/2022.(rmc)
November 1, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Vaughn on behalf of Sony Electronics Inc (Vaughn, John)Attorney John D. Vaughn added to party Sony Electronics Inc(pty:dft) (jmo).
October 31, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Wayne Rowlett on behalf of Sony Electronics Inc (Rowlett, Christopher) (jmo).
October 31, 2022 Filing 19 PRO HAC APPROVED: Gregory S. Gewirtz appearing for Defendant Sony Electronics Inc (no document attached) (jrm)
October 31, 2022 Filing 18 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17300085.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory S. Gewirtz)(Gewirtz, Gregory)
October 27, 2022 Filing 17 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-17293894.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bennett, David)
October 27, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Whitefield Ritcheson on behalf of Arability IP LLC (Ritcheson, Steven)Attorney Steven Whitefield Ritcheson added to party Arability IP LLC(pty:pla) (jmo).
October 21, 2022 Filing 15 Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo assigned to transfer case from Southern District of Texas. (no document attached) (jpp)
October 21, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 5:22-cv-00074. Original file received electronically
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Southern District of California, San Diego Division; granting #12 unopposed motion to transfer. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(VeronicaCantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
October 21, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of California, San Diego Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 10/21/2022, filed. (VeronicaCantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
October 19, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California, San Diego Division by Arability IP LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Answer due for Sony Electronics, Inc. by 10/24/2022.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the ComplaintMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Arability IP LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Unopposed #8 Motion to Extend Time for Sony Electronics, Inc., to Answer or Otherwise Response to the Complaint. Answer due for Sony Electronics, Inc. 10/10/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
August 17, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the ComplaintMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Arability IP LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sony Electronics, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dmorales, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
July 31, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arability IP LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2022. (Bennett, David) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
July 29, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sony Electronics, Inc., filed.(Ni, Hao) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
July 29, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Arability IP LLC, filed.(Ni, Hao) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) by Arability IP LLC, filed. (Ni, Hao) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sony Electronics, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28544986) filed by Arability IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/21/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arability IP LLC v. Sony Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arability IP LLC
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc
Represented By: Gregory S. Gewirtz
Represented By: John D. Vaughn
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mavexar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?