Schneider v. Molina et al
Plaintiff: Julie C. Schneider
Defendant: Alicia Molina, The Law Firm of Molina & Molina, Freedom Mortgage, Nestor Trustee Services, Supreme Lending, Amerisave, Stanley Middleman, Stan Moskowitz, Does k through q and Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv01666
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: David D Leshner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 bc Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Nestor Trustee Services (Robinson, Cathy) (anh).
December 19, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Nestor Trustee Services. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Robinson, Cathy)Attorney Cathy K Robinson added to party Nestor Trustee Services(pty:dft) (anh).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Amended ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. #17 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/14/2022.(anh)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. #17 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/14/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
December 12, 2022 Filing 17 Request for Entry of Default and Extension of Time to Answer by Julie C. Schneider. (anh)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Motion for Default Judgment [Doc No. #15 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/5/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
December 2, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment by Julie C. Schneider. (anh)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Stan Moskowitz (Robinson, Cathy) (sjt).
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Stanley Middleman, Stan Moskowitz. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Robinson, Cathy)Attorney Cathy K Robinson added to party Freedom Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Cathy K Robinson added to party Stanley Middleman(pty:dft), Attorney Cathy K Robinson added to party Stan Moskowitz(pty:dft) (sjt).
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Parties and Exhibits by Julie C. Schneider. (anh)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying Motion for Due Process [Doc. No. #10 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/7/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Due Process by Julie C. Schneider. (tcf)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Accepting Notice of Payment, Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Denying Motion for Default Judgment, and Denying Motion to Seal [Doc. Nos. #2 , #3 , #7 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/2/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
November 2, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (anh)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document, MOTION for Reconsideration by Julie C. Schneider. (anh)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number CAS141538, Paid on 11/1/2022 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Denying #3 Temporary Restraining Order and #4 Motion for Default Judgment as Moot. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/28/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs) (anh).
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment against all defendants by Julie C. Schneider. (ggv) (sjt).
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Julie C. Schneider. (ggv) (sjt).
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julie C. Schneider. (ggv) (sjt).
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Freedom Mortgage, Alicia Molina, The Law Firm of Molina & Molina, Nestor Trustee Services, Supreme Lending, Amerisave, Stanley Middleman, Stan Moskowitz, Does k through q, IFP Filed, filed by Julie C. Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1666-CAB-DDL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Schneider, Julie)(ggv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Molina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie C. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of Molina & Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestor Trustee Services
Represented By: Cathy K Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Middleman
Represented By: Cathy K Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Moskowitz
Represented By: Cathy K Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does k through q
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Cathy K Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?