Morris v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Julie Morris
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2022cv01811
Filed: November 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: David D Leshner
Referring Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bw Diversity -Breach of Warranty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Joint Motion for Payment of Plaintiff's Fees, Costs and Expenses. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/4/23. (no document attached) (Robinson, Todd)
September 19, 2023 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/19/2023 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Breita A. Linnell appeared for Plaintiff. Trina M. Clayton appeared for Defendant. Court advises parties of Civil Local Rule 7.2's requirements that any stipulation must be filed as a joint motion and that a proposed order must be submitted to the assigned judicial officer. (no document attached) (kmc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Breita Anne Linnell on behalf of Julie Morris (Linnell, Breita)Attorney Breita Anne Linnell added to party Julie Morris(pty:pla) (cxl1).
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REQUIRING APPEARANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE: A Status Conference is set for September 19, 2023. On September 18, 2023, the parties filed a Joint Motion re Plaintiff's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Request for Entry of Order (Dkt. No. #33 ). Notwithstanding the parties' agreement regarding fees, costs, and expenses, the parties shall appear for the Status Conference on September 19, 2023, at 2:30 p.m. The parties may access the Zoom link using the Notice of Videoconference Information provided at Dkt. No. #32 . (no document attached) (kmc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 33 Joint MOTION regarding plaintiff's fees, costs and expenses by Julie Morris. (Dolin, Tionna) (cxl1).
September 15, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Videoconference Information for Status Conference (cxl1)
September 8, 2023 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: Status Conference held on 9/8/2023 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Elizabeth A. LaRocque appeared for Plaintiff. Trina M. Clayton appeared for Defendant. Further remote Status Conference set for September 19, 2023, at 2:30 p.m. Instructions for remote appearances will be provided in advance of the Status Conference. (Status Conference set for 9/19/2023 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) (no document attached) (kmc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Videoconference Information for Status Conference (cxl1)
September 6, 2023 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER: On September 6, 2023, pursuant to the Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68(a), the Clerk of Court entered judgment, vacated all pending dates and deadlines, and closed the case. Dkt. Nos. #27 , #28 . Defendant's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Rule 68 contemplates a motion for attorney's fees and costs if the parties are unable to reach an agreement on this issue. Notwithstanding that the case was closed, and in light of the aforementioned term of Defendant's Rule 68 offer, the Court hereby sets a remote Status Conference for September 8, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Instructions for remote appearances will be provided to the parties in advance of the conference. (Status Conference set for 9/8/2023 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) (no document attached) (kmc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 28 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Plaintiff JULIE MORRIS accepted Defendant FCA US, LLC's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 68 in the amount of $84,877.92 on August 30, 2023. Judgment is entered in accordance with said Offer.
September 5, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Julie Morris Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) (Dolin, Tionna) (cxl1).
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Mandatory Settlement Conference Procedures. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/8/2023 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 09/05/2023.(cxl1)
August 29, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Mani Arabi on behalf of Julie Morris (Arabi, Mani)Attorney Mani Arabi added to party Julie Morris(pty:pla) (cxl1).
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF No. #22 ). Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 07/31/2023. (cxl1)
July 24, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Nino Sanaia on behalf of Julie Morris (Sanaia, Nino)Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Julie Morris(pty:pla) (cxl1).
July 19, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION of withdrawal of counsel by Julie Morris (Dolin, Tionna) (cxl1). Modified on 7/24/2023 (aas).
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Dates and Setting New Mandatory Settlement Conference Date (Dkt. No. #20 ) Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/8/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 07/13/2023. (cxl1)
July 11, 2023 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Continue by Julie Morris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Elizabeth A. Larocque in Support of Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates)(LaRocque, Elizabeth) (cxl1).
July 10, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Elizabeth A. LaRocque on behalf of Julie Morris (LaRocque, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth A. LaRocque added to party Julie Morris(pty:pla) (cxl1).
May 10, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: A Mandatory Settlement Conference ("MSC") is currently set for May 24, 2023. Due to a scheduling conflict on the Court's calendar, the MSC must be vacated.At the March 22, 2023, Status Conference, the parties reported their progress toward settling the matter. On May 3, 2023, the Court attempted to contact all counsel via email to request an update regarding the status of the parties' settlement progress and to invite the parties to request a continuance of the MSC, if necessary. Due to a lack of response, the Court followed up by email on May 5, 2023. To date, the Court has not received a response. Accordingly, the MSC is hereby VACATED. All other pretrial dates and deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. #15 ) remain unchanged and in effect. (no document attached) (kmc)
March 22, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference was held on 3/22/2023 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Ariel S. Harman-Holmes appeared for Plaintiff. Trina M. Clayton appeared for Defendant. The parties report that they are working cooperatively on discovery matters and have been engaged in informal settlement negotiations following the ENE. Given the parties' progress toward settlement, the Court advances the Mandatory Settlement Conference from October 17, 2023 to May 24, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. The settlement conference will be held remotely. Instructions for remote appearances will be provided in advance of the settlement conference. All other pretrial dates remain unchanged. See Dkt. No. #15 . (Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 5/24/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.) (no document attached) (kmc)
March 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Videoconference Information for Status Conference. Status conference set for 03/22/2023 at 11:30 a.m. (cxl1)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. Status Conference set for 3/22/2023 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/17/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 2/1/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/29/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2024 03:00 PM before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 02/10/2023.(cxl1)
February 10, 2023 Filing 14 Minute Entry: An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference were held on 2/10/2023 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Tionna Dolin appeared for Plaintiff; Trina M. Clayton appeared for Defendant. The case did not settle. Scheduling Order to issue. (no document attached) (kmc)
February 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Videoconference Information for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 02/10/2023 at 01:30PM. (cxl1)
January 27, 2023 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Julie Morris (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)Attorney Ariel S. Harman-Holmes added to party Julie Morris(pty:pla) (cxl1).
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/10/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2023 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 01/05/2023.(cxl1)
December 30, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina) (cxl1).
December 30, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft) (cxl1).
December 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Trina M. Clayton on behalf of FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)Attorney Trina M. Clayton added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft) (cxl1).
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Morris. FCA US LLC served. (Dolin, Tionna) (cxl1).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause (ECF Nos. #3 , #5 ) Accordingly, the Court DISCHARGES its November 29, 2022, Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 12/15/2022.(cxl1)
December 13, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Julie Morris re #3 Order to Show Cause,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law, #2 Exhibit 1 (Sales Contract))(Law, Daniel) (cxl1).
December 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Law on behalf of Julie Morris (Law, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Law added to party Julie Morris(pty:pla) (cxl1).
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER For Plaintiff To Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Lack Of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Plaintiff SHALL FILE a response, not to exceed ten (10) pages, within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed establishing by a preponderance of the evidence that the amount in controversy exceeds the statutory threshold of $75,000. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 11/29/2022. (fth)
November 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl1) (rmc).
November 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 through 10, FCA US LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACASDC-17356523.), filed by Julie Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1811-TWR-DDL. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (Dolin, Tionna)(cxl1) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Morris
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel Law
Represented By: Ariel S. Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A. LaRocque
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Mani Arabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?